NE LB40 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Riparian and Water Quality Practices Act
Title
Adopt the Riparian and Water Quality Practices Act
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-23 | Legislature | Blood AM469 filed |
2023-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |