NE LB397 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relocate the Game and Parks Commission headquarters to the city of Sidney, Nebraska

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relocate the Game and Parks Commission headquarters to the city of Sidney, Nebraska

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-02-13LegislatureHalloran name added
2023-02-09LegislatureMcDonnell name added
2023-02-09LegislatureBrewer name added
2023-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 09, 2023
2023-01-17LegislatureReferred to Natural Resources Committee
2023-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback