NE LB393 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions of the Livestock Animal Welfare Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions of the Livestock Animal Welfare Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2016-01-06LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2015-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 24, 2015
2015-01-20LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2015-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback