NE LB390 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB546 amended into LB390 by AM1651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for medical use of cannabidiol and naloxone and change controlled substances schedules and transfers to the Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for medical use of cannabidiol and naloxone and change controlled substances schedules and transfers to the Nebraska Health Care Cash Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-2-3 (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-29LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB546 amended into LB390 by AM1651
2015-05-29LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB326 amended into LB390 by AM1651
2015-05-27LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 27, 2015
2015-05-26LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 21, 2015
2015-05-21LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2015-05-21LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-2-3
2015-05-21LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2015-05-19LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2015-05-19LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2015-05-19LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER138 adopted
2015-05-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER138 filed
2015-05-18LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER138
2015-05-18LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2015-05-18LegislatureMorfeld AM1651 adopted
2015-05-18LegislatureCrawford AM1646 adopted
2015-05-18LegislatureCrawford AM1627 withdrawn
2015-05-18LegislatureCrawford AM1144 withdrawn
2015-05-18LegislatureJudiciary AM1011 adopted
2015-05-15LegislatureMorfeld AM1651 filed
2015-05-14LegislatureCrawford AM1646 filed
2015-05-13LegislatureCrawford AM1627 filed
2015-05-12LegislatureCrawford AM1144 filed
2015-03-30LegislatureJudiciary AM1011 filed
2015-03-30LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1011
2015-03-12LegislatureCrawford priority bill
2015-02-06LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 06, 2015
2015-01-20LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2015-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback