NE LB389 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Small Wireless Facilities Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Small Wireless Facilities Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-04-04LegislatureFriesen AM2803 filed
2018-04-04LegislatureSmith MO322 pending
2018-04-04LegislatureSmith MO322 pending
2018-04-04LegislatureSmith MO322 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
2018-04-04LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM1456 pending
2018-03-23LegislatureKrist name withdrawn
2018-02-28LegislatureMcCollister AM2137 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureMcCollister AM2131 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureMorfeld AM2138 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureQuick AM2141 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureQuick AM2139 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureSmith AM2130 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureSmith AM2129 filed
2018-02-23LegislatureFriesen AM2032 filed
2018-02-23LegislatureFriesen AM2094 filed
2018-02-23LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM1456 filed
2018-02-23LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1456
2018-02-15LegislatureLowe priority bill
2018-01-30LegislatureWayne name withdrawn
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-04-24LegislatureKrist name added
2017-04-21LegislatureFriesen AM1116 filed
2017-03-28LegislatureBrewer name added
2017-03-13LegislatureWayne name added
2017-03-13LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2017-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 21, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback