NE LB387 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB387 by AM291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB387 by AM291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the taxation of military retirement benefits
Title
Change provisions relating to the taxation of military retirement benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO76 failed (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Revenue AM291 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO76 failed (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Revenue AM291 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB387 by AM291 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Correction |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 19, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO76 failed |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO76 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Revenue AM291 adopted |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Arch name added |
2021-02-25 | Legislature | Revenue AM291 filed |
2021-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM291 |
2021-02-05 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2021-02-03 | Legislature | Hansen, B. name added |
2021-01-21 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2021-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Gragert priority bill |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |