NE LB387 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change and modernize provisions relating to juries
Title
Change and modernize provisions relating to juries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Legislature - Judiciary AM404 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Legislature - Judiciary AM404 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 13, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER163 adopted |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER163 filed |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER163 |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Judiciary AM404 adopted |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Judiciary AM404 filed |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM404 |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 14, 2019 |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |