NE LB385 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the burden of proof and who may appeal under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the burden of proof and who may appeal under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2017 |
2017-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31354 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB385.pdf |