NE LB383 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change membership provisions for certain municipal community redevelopment authorities, citizen advisory review committees, and planning commissions
Title
Change membership provisions for certain municipal community redevelopment authorities, citizen advisory review committees, and planning commissions
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Quick [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA74 withdrawn |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA74 filed |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM49 adopted |
2017-02-01 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM49 filed |
2017-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM49 |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |