NE LB381 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change expense reimbursement provisions for state officers and agencies
Title
Change expense reimbursement provisions for state officers and agencies
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Legislature - Hilgers AM2209 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM2075 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM207 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Legislature - Hilgers AM2209 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM2075 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM207 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 13, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST40 |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2209 adopted |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER149 adopted |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | Hilgers AM2209 filed |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER149 filed |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER149 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM2075 adopted |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM207 adopted |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM2075 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM207 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM207 |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019 |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |