NE LB379 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to civil liability for violations of occupant protection system requirements
Title
Change provisions relating to civil liability for violations of occupant protection system requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |