NE LB374 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB374 amended into LB752 by AM2103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB374 amended into LB752 by AM2103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Alzheimer's Disease and Other Dementia Support Act
Title
Adopt the Alzheimer's Disease and Other Dementia Support Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB374 amended into LB752 by AM2103 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1504 filed |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1504 |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |