NE LB372 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide protections for employees with family care responsibilities under the Nebraska Fair Employment Practice Act
Title
Provide protections for employees with family care responsibilities under the Nebraska Fair Employment Practice Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31576 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB372.pdf |