NE LB368 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change helmet provisions, change passenger age limits, and require eye protection for operators of motorcycles and mopeds
Title
Change helmet provisions, change passenger age limits, and require eye protection for operators of motorcycles and mopeds
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Lowe MO161 failed |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Lowe MO161 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Schumacher FA83 filed |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM503 pending |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Larson MO55 withdrawn |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Krist priority bill |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Larson MO55 Reconsider the vote to invoke cloture filed |
2017-03-14 | Legislature | Lowe MO53 failed |
2017-03-14 | Legislature | Lowe MO53 Invoke cloture filed |
2017-03-14 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM503 pending |
2017-03-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO54 withdrawn |
2017-03-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO54 Bracket until March 15, 2017 filed |
2017-03-14 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM503 pending |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Hilkemann FA43 withdrawn |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM503 pending |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM503 pending |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Hilkemann FA43 filed |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM503 pending |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM505 filed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM517 filed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM509 filed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM506 filed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Hilkemann AM503 filed |
2017-02-27 | Legislature | Lowe priority bill |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2017-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2017 |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31519 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB368.pdf |