NE LB36 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-13 - McCollister name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for review by state agencies of occupational credentials and provide for a critical assessment document

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for review by state agencies of occupational credentials and provide for a critical assessment document

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-13LegislatureMcCollister name added
2017-01-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 20, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback