NE LB359 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize damages for property taxes and special assessments paid on property lost through adverse possession
Title
Authorize damages for property taxes and special assessments paid on property lost through adverse possession
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30933 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB359.pdf |