NE LB339 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to payment of costs for proceedings before the Nebraska Liquor Control Commission
Title
Change provisions relating to payment of costs for proceedings before the Nebraska Liquor Control Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |