NE LB334 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Department of Health and Human Services provisions relating to families
Title
Change Department of Health and Human Services provisions relating to families
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Scheer name withdrawn |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Riepe name added |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30996 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB334.pdf |