NE LB330 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB486 amended into LB330 by AM113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB486 amended into LB330 by AM113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to alcoholic liquor
Title
Change provisions relating to alcoholic liquor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-1-4 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB486 amended into LB330 by AM113 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB460 amended into LB330 by AM581 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB204 amended into LB330 by AM113 |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-1-4 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Larson AM1565 withdrawn |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | McCoy FA70 withdrawn |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | McCoy FA69 withdrawn |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Kintner AM1690 withdrawn |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST48 |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | McCoy FA70 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Larson AM1565 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | McCoy FA69 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Kintner AM1690 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Larson MO122 prevailed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Larson MO122 Invoke cloture filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | McCoy FA67 lost |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | McCoy FA67 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Davis AM1546 lost |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Schumacher FA57 withdrawn |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1614 adopted |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1558 withdrawn |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Larson AM1479 adopted |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1614 filed |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1558 pending |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Larson AM1479 pending |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Larson AM101 withdrawn |
2015-05-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER92 adopted |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1558 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Davis AM1546 filed |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Larson AM1479 filed |
2015-05-04 | Legislature | Schumacher FA57 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER92 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER92 |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1316 adopted |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Chambers MO89 withdrawn |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Chambers MO89 Bracket until June 5, 2015 filed |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1316 pending |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1316 filed |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Larson AM1310 adopted |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Larson AM1310 filed |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Nordquist AM581 adopted |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Larson AM613 adopted |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | General Affairs AM113 adopted |
2015-04-20 | Legislature | Nordquist AM581 filed |
2015-04-20 | Legislature | Larson AM613 filed |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | General Affairs priority bill |
2015-02-23 | Legislature | General Affairs AM113 filed |
2015-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM113 |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Larson AM101 filed |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |