NE LB324 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB420 amended into LB324 by AM662
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB420 amended into LB324 by AM662
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide additional powers for sanitary and improvement districts and require acknowledgments from purchasers of real estate within sanitary and improvement districts
Title
Provide additional powers for sanitary and improvement districts and require acknowledgments from purchasers of real estate within sanitary and improvement districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-3-2 (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB420 amended into LB324 by AM662 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB197 amended into LB324 by AM662 |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Smith explanation of vote |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-3-2 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | McCollister AM1137 adopted |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | McCollister AM1137 filed |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO79 withdrawn |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Krist AM1114 withdrawn |
2015-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO79 Bracket until June 5, 2015 filed |
2015-04-02 | Legislature | Krist AM1114 filed |
2015-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST21 |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Craighead AM1055 adopted |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Craighead AM1055 filed |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Craighead AM791 withdrawn |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER53 adopted |
2015-03-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER53 filed |
2015-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER53 |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | Craighead AM791 filed |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | McCoy AM919 lost |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | McCoy AM919 filed |
2015-03-18 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM662 adopted |
2015-03-17 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM662 pending |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM662 filed |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM662 |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Urban Affairs priority bill |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |