NE LB321 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB321 amended into LB262 by AM2997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB321 amended into LB262 by AM2997
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Pure Food Act
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Pure Food Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB321 amended into LB262 by AM2997 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-22 | Legislature | Agriculture AM483 filed |
2023-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM483 |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Brandt AM184 filed |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Brandt AM136 filed |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Correction |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |