NE LB320 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Title
Change provisions of the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2023 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |