NE LB320 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB405 amended into LB320 by AM969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB405 amended into LB320 by AM969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Aging and Disability Resource Center Demonstration Project Act and require a state plan regarding persons with Alzheimer's or related disorders
Title
Adopt the Aging and Disability Resource Center Demonstration Project Act and require a state plan regarding persons with Alzheimer's or related disorders
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-3-4 (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB405 amended into LB320 by AM969 |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-3-4 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Readvanced to Final Reading |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Davis AM1734 withdrawn |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2015-05-20 | Legislature | Davis AM1734 filed |
2015-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Bolz AM1066 adopted |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER60 adopted |
2015-04-09 | Legislature | Bolz AM1066 filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER60 filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER60 |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Davis AM969 adopted |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Davis AM969 filed |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM767 adopted |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Corrected Health and Human Services AM767 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM418 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM418 |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Health and Human Services priority bill |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |