NE LB316 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Approved by Governor on April 24, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide protections for pharmacies to disclose information regarding drug prices and prohibit insurers from charging covered individuals in excess of certain amounts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide protections for pharmacies to disclose information regarding drug prices and prohibit insurers from charging covered individuals in excess of certain amounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Kolterman AM1187 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM778 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 24, 2019
2019-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 18, 2019
2019-04-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-04-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
2019-04-15LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-04-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-04-10LegislatureKolterman AM1187 adopted
2019-04-10LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER59 adopted
2019-04-03LegislatureKolterman AM1187 filed
2019-03-27LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER59 filed
2019-03-27LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER59
2019-03-25LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-03-25LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM778 adopted
2019-03-19LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill
2019-03-19LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM778 filed
2019-03-19LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM778
2019-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 04, 2019
2019-01-18LegislatureBriese name added
2019-01-18LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2019-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback