NE LB311 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Slama FA24 pending
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Paid Family and Medical Leave Insurance Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Paid Family and Medical Leave Insurance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20LegislatureSlama FA24 pending
2019-03-19LegislatureSlama FA24 pending
2019-03-19LegislatureSlama FA24 filed
2019-03-19LegislatureChambers MO26 withdrawn
2019-03-19LegislatureChambers MO26 Recommit to the Business and Labor Committee filed
2019-03-19LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM570 pending
2019-03-19LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM570 pending
2019-03-12LegislatureCavanaugh priority bill
2019-03-07LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM570 filed
2019-03-07LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM570
2019-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 04, 2019
2019-01-18LegislatureHilkemann name withdrawn
2019-01-17LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2019-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback