NE LB310 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB377 amended into LB310 by AM1624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB377 amended into LB310 by AM1624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change inheritance tax rates, inheritance tax exemption amounts, and individuals who are considered relatives of a decedent
Title
Change inheritance tax rates, inheritance tax exemption amounts, and individuals who are considered relatives of a decedent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 37-1-11 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - DeBoer AM1624 adopted (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - Clements AM1623 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Legislature - Revenue AM635 adopted (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - DeBoer AM1624 adopted (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Legislature - Clements AM1623 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Legislature - Revenue AM635 adopted (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB377 amended into LB310 by AM1624 |
2022-02-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-14 | Legislature | Correction |
2022-02-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 11, 2022 |
2022-02-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-02-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 37-1-11 |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST39 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | DeBoer AM1624 adopted |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | DeBoer AM1624 filed |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Clements AM1623 adopted |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Clements AM1623 filed |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER99 adopted |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER99 filed |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER99 |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Revenue AM635 adopted |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Dorn AM1551 withdrawn |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1511 withdrawn |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1511 pending |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Revenue AM635 pending |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Dorn AM1551 filed |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1511 pending |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Revenue AM635 pending |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Clements priority bill |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Albrecht AM1511 filed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Hansen, B. name added |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Revenue AM635 filed |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM635 |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |