NE LB308 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to commencement of civil actions, voluntary appearances, and waivers of defenses
Title
Change provisions relating to commencement of civil actions, voluntary appearances, and waivers of defenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 21, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |