NE LB304 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Nebraska Commission on Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Title
Appropriate funds to the Nebraska Commission on Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB304 amended into LB380 by AM393 |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |