NE LB3 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB3 amended into LB92 by AM1364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB3 amended into LB92 by AM1364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions for tax levies for bonds issued by political subdivisions
Title
Change provisions for tax levies for bonds issued by political subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB3 amended into LB92 by AM1364 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-02-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER7 filed |
2023-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER7 |
2023-02-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |