NE LB297 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change mental injuries and mental illness compensation under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Change mental injuries and mental illness compensation under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2013 |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18527 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB297.pdf |