NE LB296 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for salaries of constitutional officers
Title
Appropriate funds for salaries of constitutional officers
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1481 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM1481 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1481 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1481 filed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1481 |
2019-02-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |