NE LB296 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB296 amended into LB487 by AM568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change immunity provisions with respect to asthma and allergic reactions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change immunity provisions with respect to asthma and allergic reactions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB296 amended into LB487 by AM568
2017-05-23LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2017-05-23LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2017-05-17LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-05-11LegislatureLarson FA77 filed
2017-05-11LegislatureLarson FA76 filed
2017-05-11LegislatureLarson FA78 filed
2017-03-13LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2017-03-01LegislatureJudiciary AM276 filed
2017-03-01LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM276
2017-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 26, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback