NE LB294 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Approved by Governor on May 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Approved by Governor on May 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Human Trafficking Victims Civil Remedy Act, change provisions relating to service of process, evidence of sexual assault, search warrants, temporary custody of juveniles, and foster care reports, change penalties for human trafficking and crimes relating to morals, and provide for forfeiture of assets
Title
Adopt the Human Trafficking Victims Civil Remedy Act, change provisions relating to service of process, evidence of sexual assault, search warrants, temporary custody of juveniles, and foster care reports, change penalties for human trafficking and crimes relating to morals, and provide for forfeiture of assets
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST34 |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Scheer AM1454 adopted |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Scheer AM1349 withdrawn |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER96 adopted |
2015-05-04 | Legislature | Scheer AM1454 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER96 filed |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER96 |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Scheer AM1349 filed |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1323 adopted |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1323 filed |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1305 withdrawn |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1104 adopted |
2015-04-21 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1305 filed |
2015-04-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1104 filed |
2015-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1104 |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Watermeier name added |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Scheer priority bill |
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2015 |
2015-01-30 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |