NE LB293 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB293 amended into LB487 by AM568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB293 amended into LB487 by AM568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Include U-47700 as a Schedule I controlled substance under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Title
Include U-47700 as a Schedule I controlled substance under the Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB293 amended into LB487 by AM568 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31492 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB293.pdf |