NE LB290 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for voter registration upon application for driver's license, state identification card, or certain benefits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for voter registration upon application for driver's license, state identification card, or certain benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-03LegislatureVargas AM1472 filed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 09, 2017
2017-02-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 15, 2017 (cancel)
2017-02-22LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 15, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback