NE LB290 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB290 amended into LB292 by AM849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB290 amended into LB292 by AM849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate certain notification requirements under the Sex Offender Registration Act and eliminate the offense of unlawful use of the Internet by a prohibited sex offender
Title
Eliminate certain notification requirements under the Sex Offender Registration Act and eliminate the offense of unlawful use of the Internet by a prohibited sex offender
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB290 amended into LB292 by AM849 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2015-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |