NE LB290 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Correction
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Correction
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Residential Mortgage Licensing Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the Residential Mortgage Licensing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Legislature | Correction |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2013 |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Kolowski explanation of vote |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2013-03-01 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2013-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-02-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-02-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-01-29 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2013 |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |