NE LB289 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change and provide provisions relating to sex offenses and domestic violence protection orders, provide for sexual assault protection orders, and change provisions relating to paternity of a child conceived as a result of sexual assault
Title
Change and provide provisions relating to sex offenses and domestic violence protection orders, provide for sexual assault protection orders, and change provisions relating to paternity of a child conceived as a result of sexual assault
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB188 amended into LB289 by AM599 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB178 amended into LB289 by AM599 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2017-05-16 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST32 |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1331 adopted |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Morfeld AM1331 filed |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1175 adopted |
2017-05-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER39 adopted |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1175 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER39 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER39 |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Ebke AM599 adopted |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM785 adopted |
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Morfeld AM786 adopted |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM785 filed |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Morfeld AM786 pending |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Morfeld AM786 filed |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Ebke AM599 pending |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Ebke AM599 filed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Judiciary priority bill |
2017-03-02 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2017-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-28 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2017-02-21 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2017 |
2017-01-26 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |