NE LB289 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB289 amended into LB3 by AM1067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB289 amended into LB3 by AM1067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to duration of real estate improvement contract liens
Title
Change provisions relating to duration of real estate improvement contract liens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB289 amended into LB3 by AM1067 |
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone approved |
2013-06-03 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2013-04-11 | Legislature | Judiciary AM571 filed |
2013-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM571 |
2013-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2013 |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18491 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB289.pdf |