NE LB285 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB514 amended into LB285 by AM1300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB514 amended into LB285 by AM1300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to adjusting boundaries for elections and change and eliminate provisions regarding elections for various purposes
Title
Change provisions relating to adjusting boundaries for elections and change and eliminate provisions regarding elections for various purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Brewer AM1354 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Brewer AM1300 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM431 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Brewer AM1354 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Brewer AM1300 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM431 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB514 amended into LB285 by AM1300 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Hansen, M. explanation of vote |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-05-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST38 |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Brewer AM1354 adopted |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Brewer AM1300 adopted |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Brewer AM1133 withdrawn |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Brewer AM1134 withdrawn |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Brewer AM1264 withdrawn |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Brewer AM1299 withdrawn |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Brewer AM1354 filed |
2021-05-07 | Legislature | Brewer AM1300 filed |
2021-05-07 | Legislature | Brewer AM1299 filed |
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Brewer AM1264 filed |
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Brewer AM1134 filed |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 05, 2021 on AM1133 |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Brewer AM1133 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-15 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM431 adopted |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM431 filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM431 |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021 |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |