NE LB279 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Notice of hearing for February 27, 2017
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require lap-shoulder belts on school buses as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require lap-shoulder belts on school buses as prescribed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 27, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback