NE LB265 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Unsecured Consumer Loan Licensing Act and clarify licensing provisions under the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act and the Nebraska Installment Loan Act
Title
Adopt the Unsecured Consumer Loan Licensing Act and clarify licensing provisions under the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act and the Nebraska Installment Loan Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 12, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37586 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB265.pdf |