NE LB265 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB443 amended into LB265 by AM1349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB443 amended into LB265 by AM1349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Children's Residential Facilities and Placing Licensure Act and change foster care licensure and kinship home and relative home provisions
Title
Adopt the Children's Residential Facilities and Placing Licensure Act and change foster care licensure and kinship home and relative home provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB443 amended into LB265 by AM1349 |
2013-05-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Coash explanation of vote |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2013-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2013-05-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Cook AM1349 adopted |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Cook AM1349 filed |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Cook MO66 prevailed |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Cook MO66 Permit consideration of AM1349 filed |
2013-05-10 | Legislature | Cook AM989 withdrawn |
2013-04-18 | Legislature | Cook AM989 filed |
2013-04-16 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER47 adopted |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER47 filed |
2013-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER47 |
2013-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-05 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM415 adopted |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM415 filed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM415 |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2013 |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |