NE LB264 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent to appropriate funds for cultural districts created by the Nebraska Arts Council
Title
State intent to appropriate funds for cultural districts created by the Nebraska Arts Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB264 amended into LB380 by AM393 |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2021 |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Sanders name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |