NE LB263 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require occupational boards to issue certain credentials based on credentials or work experience in another jurisdiction
Title
Require occupational boards to issue certain credentials based on credentials or work experience in another jurisdiction
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-04 | Legislature | Sanders name added |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | McCollister name withdrawn |
2021-01-29 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Pahls name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Brandt name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |