NE LB255 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change eminent domain and renewable energy generation provisions relating to certain power suppliers
Title
Change eminent domain and renewable energy generation provisions relating to certain power suppliers
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2023 |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |