NE LB254 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB883 amended into LB254 by AM2901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate a termination date for insurance coverage for anticancer medication and provide insurance coverage for autism spectrum disorder and funding for amino acid-based elemental formulas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate a termination date for insurance coverage for anticancer medication and provide insurance coverage for autism spectrum disorder and funding for amino acid-based elemental formulas

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB883 amended into LB254 by AM2901
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB505 amended into LB254 by AM2901
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB397 amended into LB254 by AM2901
2014-04-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 21, 2014
2014-04-17LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 17, 2014
2014-04-17LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2014-04-17LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
2014-04-17LegislatureChambers AM2941 withdrawn
2014-04-17LegislatureChambers AM2941 filed
2014-04-17LegislatureMotion to return to Select File withdrawn
2014-04-09LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST94
2014-04-09LegislatureCoash name added
2014-04-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2014-04-09LegislatureCoash AM2901 adopted
2014-04-08LegislatureCoash AM2901 filed
2014-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill.
2013-02-08LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2013-02-07LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2013-02-05LegislaturePlaced on General File
2013-01-22LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 29, 2013
2013-01-18LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2013-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback