NE LB253 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize intergovernmental service agreements under the County Industrial Sewer Construction Act and authorize a use for a sewer tax levy
Title
Authorize intergovernmental service agreements under the County Industrial Sewer Construction Act and authorize a use for a sewer tax levy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 03, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2017-04-26 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER59 adopted |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER59 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER59 |
2017-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-13 | Legislature | Crawford AM829 adopted |
2017-04-13 | Legislature | Revenue AM693 adopted |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Smith name added |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Crawford AM829 filed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Revenue AM693 filed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM693 |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2017-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |