NE LB25 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for additional fees under the Uniform Credentialing Act and create the Patient Safety Cash Fund
Title
Provide for additional fees under the Uniform Credentialing Act and create the Patient Safety Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |