NE LB25 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions for presidential electors
Title
Change provisions for presidential electors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Wayne MO93 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Section 3(f) filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-02-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31415 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB25.pdf |